Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Sponsored by
Senators Jackson, Bailey, Elfreth, Griffith, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to appropriate $900,000 to the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland from the Cigarette Restitution Fund in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; requiring the funds appropriated under the Act to be used for the purpose of funding the activities of the Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission; and providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0646
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {833227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {103520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {833227/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {103520/1 Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text - Chapter - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page