Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Oaks, Robinson, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to publish notice of license application in two newspapers instead of three.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1185
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {653220/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Floor Amendment {653220/2 (Senator Conway) Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
House 3/12/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Economic Matters 43AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
(   12-102, 12-1506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page