Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain regulations to include a requirement that any swab, slide, or other DNA collection item included in a certain sexual assault evidence collection kit be tested within 1 year after the item was collected.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0008
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Testing Requirement
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page