Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Sponsored by
Senators McCray and Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to encourage the establishment of makerspaces throughout the State; authorizing the Corporation to partner with a certain entity to provide technical assistance to certain nonprofit entities and to award certain financial assistance to local governments, certain designees of local government, and certain nonprofit entities for the establishment of makerspaces in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0577 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Ways and Means 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 322
Text - Chapter - Economic Development – Maryland Makerspace Initiative Program
(   10-4C-01 through 10-4C-06 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:56 PM
Click to return on the top page