Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, King, Peters, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland corporate income tax for certain changes to a certain corporation's deferred tax assets or liabilities that are the result of Chapters 341 and 342 of the Acts of the General Assembly of 2018; providing for the calculation of the amount of the subtraction modification; providing that the subtraction modification may be claimed only for 10 consecutive taxable years beginning with the first taxable year that begins after December 31, 2028; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-3)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {869837/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment - Deferred Tax Relief
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-3) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
(   10-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page