Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Corderman, and Hester
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board; establishing the Senator George C. Edwards Fund to provide grant or loan funding to capital infrastructure and business development projects that improve the economic conditions in the Western Maryland region; requiring the Board to develop criteria to review, evaluate, and rate certain proposals for funding, to distribute certain funding, and to monitor and track the progress of certain projects that have received funding; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0838
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0803 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {903722/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Fund - Establishment
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Ways and Means 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {663026/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Western Maryland Economic Future Investment Board and Senator George C. Edwards Fund - Establishment
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page