Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, for certain fiscal years, the Comptroller to distribute certain abandoned property funds to the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund; establishing the Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders Fund to provide grants to the University of Maryland School of Law, the University of Baltimore School of Law, and the Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service to operate tax clinics for low-income Marylanders; authorizing the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2024, to include an appropriation to the Fund in the budget bill; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0421
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {369031/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {535660/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-7)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {369031/1 Adopted 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Distribution – Tax Clinics for Low–Income Marylanders
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Referred Ways and Means 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {535660/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-7) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Text - Chapter - Tax Clinics for Low-Income Marylanders
(   11-409 )
(   2-608.2, 2-609 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page