Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on the sale, distribution, and disposal of certain drugs, medicines, pharmaceutical preparations, and medical preparations by means of a vending machine or similar device.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0107
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {503223/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (38-8)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
20AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hough) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Favorable Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Floor Amendment {503223/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-32) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Second Reading Passed 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Third Reading Passed (38-8) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 20AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 497
Text - Chapter - Prohibition on Vending Machine Sales of Drugs and Medicines - Repeal
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:02 PM
Click to return on the top page