Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Senators Smith, Hettleman, Carter, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from not more than $18 to not less than $120, the surcharge that the District Court is required to assess per civil case for summary ejectment, tenant holding over, and breach of lease that seeks a judgment for possession of residential property against a residential tenant; requiring the District Court to assess the surcharge against a landlord and prohibiting the court from awarding or assigning the surcharge against a residential tenant; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0729
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Actions - Filing Surcharge and Prohibited Lease Provisions
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page