Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the list of organizations in certain counties that may be licensed to operate not more than five instant ticket lottery machines to include certain fraternal and sororal organizations in Carroll County, provided that the organization is not a high school or college fraternity or sorority or any other organization the membership of which is restricted wholly or largely to certain students or graduates; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0818
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1023 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Carroll County - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page