Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual to notify the local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency if the individual has reason to believe that a verbal threat of imminent severe bodily harm or death to a child has been made by a specified individual and that the child is at substantial risk of child abuse; specifying the procedures and requirements for a report concerning a verbal threat of harm to a child; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0825
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   5-704.1, 5-706.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page