Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Hester, Beidle, Kagan, Pinsky, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 305
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of certain cost-sharing funds to fund a conservation practice that does not meet certain requirements; authorizing certain cost-sharing funds to be made available for certain fixed natural filter practices; prohibiting basing a reduction in certain cost-sharing rates on tons of soil saved or an amortization formula; requiring that cost-sharing rates for the planting of multiple species of cover crops equal or exceed the rates paid for the planting a single species of cover crop; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0687
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184234/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-40)
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 305
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {184234/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {184234/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (94-40) 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 305
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
(   8-701, 8-703, 8-704 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM
Click to return on the top page