Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Class 5 Breweries - Hours of Sale for On-Premises Consumption
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the hours of sale for certain Class 5 breweries by specifying that a holder of any Class 5 brewery license with an on-site consumption permit and a Class D or equivalent license issued by a local licensing board may serve or sell beer for on-premises consumption during the hours specified on the Class D or equivalent license.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Class 5 Breweries - Hours of Sale for On-Premises Consumption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Class 5 Breweries - Hours of Sale for On-Premises Consumption
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page