Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to study and compile information regarding certain matters that relate to certain crime firearms; requiring the Department of State Police to provide certain information for the study; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Crime Firearms - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {752016/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Crime Firearms - Study
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {208677/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Judiciary 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {752016/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text - Chapter - Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page