Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt on each Sunday of the game bird and game mammal seasons in Worcester County; authorizing the Department to allow a person to hunt on public land designated for hunting by the Department on Sundays in Worcester County; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0856
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Worcester County - Sunday Hunting - Game Bird and Game Mammal Seasons and Public Land
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:19 PM
Click to return on the top page