Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the CAM for Veterans Grant Program to provide grants to veterans suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder, anxiety, depression, or stress for financial assistance to obtain certain medical treatments; requiring the Maryland Veterans Trust to implement and administer the Program; requiring the Trust to expend money from the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund to provide grants for the Program; and requiring the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to adopt certain regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0874
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 2/22/2021 Second Reading Passed 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Veterans Trust Fund – CAM for Veterans Grant Program – Established (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9-913, 9-914.2, 9-914.4 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:19 PM
Click to return on the top page