Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Robotics Grant Program – Nonprofit Robotics Clubs
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for existing nonprofit robotics clubs to receive a grant under the Robotics Grant Program regardless of whether the nonprofit robotics club is associated with a public school.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Robotics Grant Program – Nonprofit Robotics Clubs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – Robotics Grant Program – Nonprofit Robotics Clubs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education – Robotics Grant Program – Nonprofit Robotics Clubs
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Robotics Grant Program – Nonprofit Robotics Clubs
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Subjects
(   7-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page