Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "practice athletic training"; repealing certain provisions of law requiring an athletic trainer to practice in a certain setting; altering the information that is required to be included in an evaluation and treatment protocol; authorizing an athletic trainer to provide treatment for not more than 14 days to a certain athletic individual unless the trainer has received a referral from a certain health care provider; providing that preventive care is not considered treatment for a certain purpose; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0576
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Lam)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {613426/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {884933/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Lam) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {613426/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Text - Chapter - Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
(   14-5D-01, 14-5D-04, 14-5D-05, 14-5D-07, 14-5D-10, 14-5D-11 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page