Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Revising, restating, and recodifying the laws of the State relating to the Maryland Technology Development Corporation; making certain technical and stylistic changes; providing for the construction of the Act; authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code to make certain corrections in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
Senate 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Text - Chapter - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Revision
(   10-401, 10-402, 10-403, 10-404 through 10-408, 10-409, 10-410 through 10-415, 10-418 through 10-426, 10-429 through 10-431, 10-432, 10-434 through 10-442, 10-445 through 10-451, 10-454, 10-455, 10-456, 10-457, 10-458, 10-459, 10-460, 10-463, 10-464, 10-465, 10-468 through 10-470, 10-473, 10-473 through 10-478, 10-481 through 10-484, 10-487 through 10-494, 10-496 through 10-499 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:19 PM
Click to return on the top page