Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the court to admit into evidence in certain criminal proceedings certain out of court statements made by a child victim or vulnerable adult victim subject to certain requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1122
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child and Vulnerable Adult Victims
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page