Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Garrett County to enact a local law and adopt regulations relating to the location of any marijuana facility in Garrett County.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0973
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Garrett County Commissioners - Marijuana Facilities - Location
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page