Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing certain goals and programs related to land conservation; establishing the Local Land Trust Revolving Loan Program to provide loans to certain land trusts to purchase land for conservation purposes; establishing a Land Preservation Rapid Response Advisory Committee to review loan applications and make recommendations on which projects to fund; establishing the Local Land Trust Revolving Loan Fund; requiring the Governor to include $10,000,000 in the fiscal year 2024 budget bill for the Fund; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1031
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/08/2022 3/08/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
(   3-201,   3-214 through 3-216, 5-104, 5-307,   5-9D-01 through 5-9D-04 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page