Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman and Elfreth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a law enforcement agency from presenting certain victims of sexually assaultive behavior with forms purporting to limit the obligations of the criminal justice unit to the victim or limit the rights of the victim; authorizing victims affected by a violation of the Act to bring an action for injunctive or declaratory relief; requiring law enforcement agencies to adopt and submit policies for enforcing the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1575
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {278272/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {278272/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53CClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Waivers of Rights - Prohibition
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page