Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a physician assistant to practice under a collaboration agreement with a signing physician rather than under a delegation agreement with a primary supervising physician; requiring a physician assistant to submit a collaboration agreement to the State Board of Physicians before October 1, 2023; altering the scope of practice for a licensed physician assistant; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0961
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Revisions
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page