Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Emergency Management to take action to reduce the disaster risk and vulnerability of critical infrastructure; establishing the Critical Infrastructure Cybersecurity Grant Program in the Department to leverage certain funds to make cybersecurity improvements to critical infrastructure; altering the duties and staffing requirements of the Public Service Commission to include cybersecurity; authorizing the Office of People's Counsel to retain or hire an expert in cybersecurity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Cybersecurity - Critical Infrastructure and Public Service Companies (Critical Infrastructure Security Act of 2022)
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page