Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Carter (By Request - Juvenile Justice Reform Council)
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2023, to appropriate at least $2,000,000 in the annual budget bill for a grant to Roca Baltimore, LLC; requiring the Juvenile Justice Reform Council to submit a supplemental report on its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1, 2021; and extending the termination date of the Council to June 30, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1187
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488374/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488374/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {313824/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {488374/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Carter) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments {488374/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {313824/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Juvenile Justice Reform Council Extension and Grant Funding
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
(   4-1010 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page