Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Companies - Billing Information
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an electric company to provide to a retail electricity customer on request the historic usage and billing information for not less than the preceding 12 months; and providing that the electric company must make the information available, as requested by the customer, either on the company's website, electronically to the customer in a PDF format, or sent to the customer's billing address.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0842
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electric Companies - Billing Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Electric Companies - Billing Information
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Electric Companies - Billing Information
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electric Companies - Billing Information
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Returned Passed 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 12:32 PM
Click to return on the top page