Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Edible Cannabis Products
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to allow certain dispensaries and dispensary agents to acquire, possess, transfer, transport, sell, distribute, or dispense edible cannabis products for use by a qualifying patient or caregiver; requiring the Commission, in consultation with the Maryland Department of Health, to require a dispensary to comply with certain requirements that the Commission determines are necessary to include requiring a permit for the dispensing of edible cannabis products; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0017
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Food Containing Medical Cannabis
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {268972/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission – Edible Cannabis Products
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   13-3301, 13-3307, 13-3309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page