Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotate Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of certain errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Favorable 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Motion Special Order until 3/3 (Senator King) Adopted 18AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Text - Chapter - Annual Corrective Bill
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page