Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Collaborations to Promote Provider Alignment
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting collaborations to promote provider alignment from provisions of law that prohibit a health care practitioner from referring a patient or directing persons to refer a patient to a specified health care entity, prohibit a health care practitioner from presenting or causing to be presented specified demands for payment, and require a health care practitioner to disclose the existence of a beneficial interest under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1272
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
(   19-1C-01 through 19-1C-03 )
(   1-302, 1-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page