Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the maximum number of years of eligibility service that certain members of the State Police Retirement System may have to participate in the Deferred Retirement Option Program (DROP) to 30; increasing the number of years that certain members of the State Police Retirement System may participate in the DROP; authorizing certain individuals, subject to certain limitations and requirements, to elect to extend their participation in the DROP; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1049
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {829932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m.
Text - First - State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {829932/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Appropriations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 726
Text - Chapter - State Police Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program - Alterations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page