Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the limitations on the amount of compensatory damages and punitive damages that may be awarded to a complainant in a certain unlawful employment case; increasing the period of time, from 2 years to 3 years, for which a claimant may recover back pay in a certain unlawful employment case; and increasing the period of time, from 2 years to 3 years, during which a complainant may file a civil action that alleges an unlawful employment practice that does not allege harassment.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {578278/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123623/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {578278/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unlawful Employment Practice - Statute of Limitations and Remedies
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Economic Matters 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments {123623/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
(   20-1009, 20-1013 )
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:12 PM
Click to return on the top page