Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Task Force on Rural, Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service, in conducting a certain study, to solicit input from local governments, Internet service providers, and wireless service providers on identifying unserved and underserved rural areas of Maryland; requiring the Task Force to make recommendations regarding ways Maryland counties can work together to obtain federal assistance to improve Internet, Broadband, wireless, and other cellular services and accessibility in rural areas of Maryland; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0243
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {647970/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Text - Chapter - Task Force on Rural Internet, Broadband, Wireless, and Cellular Service - Study and Extension
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page