Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the juvenile court to conduct a hearing to review the status of a child placed in a qualified residential treatment program and make a certain determination within a certain period of time after the child enters the placement; requiring the juvenile court to review a certain assessment and consider certain factors at a certain hearing; requiring the juvenile court to state, in writing, the reasons for its decision to approve or disapprove the continued placement of a child in a qualified residential program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act)
Senate 3/08/2019 3/11/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act)
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text - Chapter - Children in Need of Assistance - Qualified Residential Treatment Programs (Family First Prevention Services Act)
(   3-801, 3-816.2, 3-823 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page