Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Aerospace, Electronics, or Defense Contract Tax Credit Program
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified business entity operating a specified aerospace, electronics, or defense contract tax credit project to claim a credit against the State income tax; requiring the Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce to certify a business entity as a qualified business entity within a specified period of time; providing that a project is eligible for designation by the Department as an aerospace, electronics, or defense contract tax credit project under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {273128/1 Rejected (14-29)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Robinson) {173221/1 Rejected (33-101)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (76-57)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2016 2/23/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/01/2016 3/02/2016 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {273128/1 Rejected (14-29) 61
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate S. Robinson) {173221/1 Rejected (33-101) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (76-57) 70
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
(   1-101, 2.5-109, 6-701 through 6-707 )
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page