Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freedom of the Press Day
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating June 28 as Freedom of the Press Day in Maryland to memorialize the lives lost on June 28, 2018, at the Capital Gazette offices.
Details
Cross-filed with: HJ0009
Bill File Type: Regular
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Freedom of the Press Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Freedom of the Press Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Freedom of the Press Day
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Freedom of the Press Day
Senate 3/05/2019 3/06/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Freedom of the Press Day
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2
Text - Chapter - Freedom of the Press Day
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page