Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0004 /CH0169 (SB0032/CH0168)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0074 (SB0260)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 /CH0088
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Breweries and Micro-Breweries
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231 (SB0223/CH0207)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's License
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0404
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704 (SB0755)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsor
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978 /CH0396
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 (SB0806)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1416
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1420 (SB0990)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 /CH0168 (HB0004/CH0169)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 /CH0207 (HB0231)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's License
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260 (HB0074)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0755 (HB0704)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 (HB1172)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 /CH0589
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's License
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0990 (HB1420)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting Orders
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0004 /CH0169 (SB0032/CH0168) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0074 (SB0260) Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0230 /CH0088 Alcoholic Beverages - Farm Breweries and Micro-Breweries Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 (SB0223/CH0207) Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's License Delegate Schulz 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0404 Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D Licenses Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 Video Lottery Operation Licenses - Expansion to Alcoholic Beverages Licensed Establishments Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0590 Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at Retail Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0701 Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Obsolete Provisions of Law Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0704 (SB0755) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit Delegate Haddaway-Riccio 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0978 /CH0396 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 (SB0806) Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1416 Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - Prohibited Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1420 (SB0990) Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting Orders Delegate Barkley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0032 /CH0168 (HB0004/CH0169) Alcoholic Beverages - Brewery License - On-Premises Consumption Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0223 /CH0207 (HB0231) Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's License Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0260 (HB0074) Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0755 (HB0704) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production Limit Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0806 (HB1172) Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0955 /CH0589 Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's License Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0990 (HB1420) Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipping - Means of Transmitting Orders Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page