Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers/Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747 /CH0276 (SB0539)
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Licensure Requirement - Exemption for Lawyers
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Home Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0936
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0638 (SB0815)
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property, Registration Requirement, and Access to Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 (SB0836)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1421
Title
Real Property - Real Estate Sales Contracts - Required Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453 /CH0433 (SB0824/CH0432)
Title
Real Estate Licensees - Verification of Service Provider Licensing Status
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 /CH0311 (SB0828)
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0539 (HB0747/CH0276)
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Licensure Requirement - Exemption for Lawyers
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB0989/CH0638)
Title
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0432 (HB1453/CH0433)
Title
Real Estate Licensees - Verification of Service Provider Licensing Status
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0828 (HB1469/CH0311)
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1274)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0106 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0747 /CH0276 (SB0539) Real Estate Brokers - Licensure Requirement - Exemption for Lawyers Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0759 Home Act of 2016 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0936 Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - Continuing Education Requirements Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 /CH0638 (SB0815) Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 638
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1171 Foreclosed Property Registry - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property, Registration Requirement, and Access to Registry Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 (SB0836) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1421 Real Property - Real Estate Sales Contracts - Required Notice Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 /CH0433 (SB0824/CH0432) Real Estate Licensees - Verification of Service Provider Licensing Status Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1469 /CH0311 (SB0828) Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent Requirements Delegate Carey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0539 (HB0747/CH0276) Real Estate Brokers - Licensure Requirement - Exemption for Lawyers Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0815 (HB0989/CH0638) Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer Charges Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0824 /CH0432 (HB1453/CH0433) Real Estate Licensees - Verification of Service Provider Licensing Status Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0828 (HB1469/CH0311) Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent Requirements Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0836 (HB1274) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/22/2022 1:48 AM
Click to return on the top page