Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers/Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019 /CH0590
Title
Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972
Title
Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0781)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB1095)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 /CH0590 Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0560 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0952 Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0972 Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1095 (SB0781) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0781 (HB1095) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 1/20/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page