Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Floor Actions

Calendar Date Legislative Date Proceedings Number
April 11, 2022 April 3, 2022 74 (Journalized)
April 11, 2022 April 2, 2022 73 (Journalized)
April 11, 2022 April 1, 2022 72 (Journalized)
April 11, 2022 March 31, 2022 71 (Journalized)
April 9, 2022 March 30, 2022 70-A (Journalized)
April 9, 2022 March 30, 2022 70 (Journalized)
April 9, 2022 March 29, 2022 69 (Journalized)
April 8, 2022 March 28, 2022 68 (Journalized)
April 8, 2022 March 27, 2022 67-A (Journalized)
April 8, 2022 March 27, 2022 67 (Journalized)
April 7, 2022 March 26, 2022 66-A (Journalized)
April 7, 2022 March 26, 2022 66 (Journalized)
April 6, 2022 March 25, 2022 65 (Journalized)
April 5, 2022 March 24, 2022 64 (Journalized)
April 4, 2022 March 23, 2022 63 (Journalized)
April 1, 2022 March 22, 2022 62 (Journalized)
March 31, 2022 March 21, 2022 61 (Journalized)
March 31, 2022 March 20, 2022 60 (Journalized)
March 31, 2022 March 19, 2022 59 (Journalized)
March 30, 2022 March 18, 2022 58 (Journalized)
March 29, 2022 March 17, 2022 57 (Journalized)
March 29, 2022 March 16, 2022 56 (Journalized)
March 28, 2022 March 15, 2022 55 (Journalized)
March 25, 2022 March 14, 2022 54 (Journalized)
March 24, 2022 March 13, 2022 53 (Journalized)
March 23, 2022 March 12, 2022 52 (Journalized)
March 22, 2022 March 11, 2022 51 (Journalized)
March 21, 2022 March 10, 2022 50-A (Journalized)
March 21, 2022 March 10, 2022 50 (Journalized)
March 21, 2022 March 9, 2022 49 (Journalized)
March 21, 2022 March 8, 2022 48 (Journalized)
March 18, 2022 March 7, 2022 47 (Journalized)
March 18, 2022 March 6, 2022 46 (Journalized)
March 17, 2022 March 5, 2022 45-A (Journalized)
March 17, 2022 March 5, 2022 45 (Journalized)
March 16, 2022 March 4, 2022 44-A (Journalized)
March 16, 2022 March 4, 2022 44 (Journalized)
March 15, 2022 March 3, 2022 43 (Journalized)
March 14, 2022 March 2, 2022 42 (Journalized)
March 11, 2022 March 1, 2022 41 (Journalized)
March 10, 2022 February 28, 2022 40-A (Journalized)
March 10, 2022 February 28, 2022 40 (Journalized)
March 9, 2022 February 27, 2022 39 (Journalized)
March 8, 2022 February 26, 2022 38 (Journalized)
March 7, 2022 February 25, 2022 37 (Journalized)
March 4, 2022 February 24, 2022 36 (Journalized)
March 3, 2022 February 23, 2022 35 (Journalized)
March 2, 2022 February 22, 2022 34 (Journalized)
March 1, 2022 February 21, 2022 33-B (Journalized)
March 1, 2022 February 21, 2022 33-A (Journalized)
March 1, 2022 February 21, 2022 33 (Journalized)
February 28, 2022 February 20, 2022 32-A (Journalized)
February 25, 2022 February 20, 2022 32 (Journalized)
February 24, 2022 February 19, 2022 31 (Journalized)
February 23, 2022 February 18, 2022 30 (Journalized)
February 22, 2022 February 17, 2022 29 (Journalized)
February 21, 2022 February 16, 2022 28-A
February 21, 2022 February 16, 2022 28 (Journalized)
February 18, 2022 February 15, 2022 27 (Journalized)
February 17, 2022 February 14, 2022 26 (Journalized)
February 16, 2022 February 13, 2022 25 (Journalized)
February 15, 2022 February 12, 2022 24 (Journalized)
February 14, 2022 February 11, 2022 23-A (Journalized)
February 11, 2022 February 11, 2022 23 (Journalized)
February 10, 2022 February 10, 2022 22 (Journalized)
February 9, 2022 February 9, 2022 21 (Journalized)
February 8, 2022 February 8, 2022 20 (Journalized)
February 7, 2022 February 7, 2022 19 (Journalized)
February 4, 2022 February 4, 2022 18 (Journalized)
February 3, 2022 February 3, 2022 17 (Journalized)
February 2, 2022 February 2, 2022 16 (Journalized)
February 1, 2022 February 1, 2022 15 (Journalized)
January 31, 2022 January 31, 2022 14 (Journalized)
January 28, 2022 January 28, 2022 13 (Journalized)
January 27, 2022 January 27, 2022 12 (Journalized)
January 26, 2022 January 26, 2022 11 (Journalized)
January 25, 2022 January 25, 2022 10 (Journalized)
January 24, 2022 January 24, 2022 9 (Journalized)
January 21, 2022 January 21, 2022 8 (Journalized)
January 20, 2022 January 20, 2022 7 (Journalized)
January 19, 2022 January 19, 2022 6 (Journalized)
January 18, 2022 January 18, 2022 5 (Journalized)
January 17, 2022 January 17, 2022 4 (Journalized)
January 14, 2022 January 14, 2022 3 (Journalized)
January 13, 2022 January 13, 2022 2 (Journalized)
January 12, 2022 January 12, 2022 1 (Journalized)
Click to return on the top page