Status of LegislationTotal number of Bills: 9
Status as of January 21, 2008: Bill is in the House - First Reading Appropriations
Status as of April 8, 2008: Became Law - Chapter 30
Status as of March 22, 2008: Bill is in the House - Unfavorable Health and Government Operations
Status as of April 24, 2008: Became Law - Chapter 119
Status as of April 8, 2008: Became Law - Chapter 19
Status as of April 8, 2008: Became Law - Chapter 29
Status as of March 21, 2008: Bill is in the House - First Reading Appropriations
Status as of February 13, 2008: Bill is in the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Status as of February 18, 2008: Bill is in the Senate - Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs