Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 220

File Code: Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 217
Sponsored By:
Delegates Beidle, Ali, Aumann, Barnes, Bobo, Boteler, Cane, V. Clagett, Costa, Dwyer, Elmore, Frush, George, Glassman, Healey, Hecht, Holmes, Hucker, James, Jameson, Jennings, J. King, Kipke, Kullen, Lafferty, Lawton, Levy, Love, Malone, Mathias, McConkey, McIntosh, O'Donnell, Pena-Melnyk, Riley, Schuh, Shewell, Sophocleus, Sossi, Weir, Glenn, Niemann, and Stull
Entitled:
Vehicle Laws - Special and Commemorative Registration Plates

Synopsis:

Repealing the authority of the Motor Vehicle Administration to issue specified special commemorative registration plates for Class B (for hire) vehicles; altering the termination date for the Chesapeake Bay Commemorative License Plate and the special registration plate honoring State agriculture; repealing the termination date for specified provisions related to the design of and renewal fees for the Chesapeake Bay Commemorative License Plate; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
1/29
First Reading Environmental Matters
1/31
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2/20
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/21
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/23
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
3/28
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Delegates Beidle, Ali, and Sossi
4/1
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
4/2
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
2/26
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
3/30
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/28
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/29
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
3/31
Senate Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Senators Forehand, Brochin, and Simonaire
4/2
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/24
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 136

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pamela Beidle, District 32
Delegate Saqib Ali, District 39
Delegate Susan L. M. Aumann, District 42
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate Joseph C. Boteler, III, District 8
Delegate Rudolph C. Cane, District 37A
Delegate Virginia P. Clagett, District 30
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate Donald H. Dwyer, Jr., District 31
Delegate D. Page Elmore, District 38A
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Ronald A. George, District 30
Delegate Barry Glassman, District 35A
Delegate Cheryl Glenn, District 45
Delegate Anne Healey, District 22
Delegate Sue Hecht, District 3A
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., District 23B
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Mary-Dulany James, District 34A
Delegate Sally Jameson, District 28
Delegate J. B. Jennings, District 7
Delegate James S. King, District 33A
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B
Delegate Stephen W. Lafferty, District 42
Delegate Jane E. Lawton, District 18
Delegate Murray D. Levy, District 28
Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate James E. Malone, Jr., District 12A
Delegate James N. Mathias, Jr., District 38B
Delegate Tony McConkey, District 33A
Delegate Maggie McIntosh, District 43
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Anthony J. O'Donnell, District 29C
Delegate Joseline Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate B. Daniel Riley, District 34A
Delegate Steven R. Schuh, District 31
Delegate Tanya Shewell, District 5A
Delegate Theodore Sophocleus, District 32
Delegate Richard A. Sossi, District 36
Delegate Paul S. Stull, District 4A
Delegate Michael H. Weir, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Agriculture -see also- Farmland
Chesapeake Bay
For-Hire Driving -see also- Taxicabs
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Sunset
Taxicabs

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Transportation
( 13-618 , 13-619.2 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 530618/01     Offered on: February 21, 2007   at: 10:15 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 928679/01     Offered on: March 30, 2007   at: 11:33 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Conference Committee Documents (Displayed in PDF Format):
Report Number: 573120/1     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 4:04 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 393824/1     Offered on: April 6, 2007   at: 4:04 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 23, 2007: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
April 1, 2007: Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Senate
March 29, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 2, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Click to return on the top page