Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 193

File Code: Gaming
Sponsored By:
Delegates Love and Kullen
Entitled:
Gaming - Bingo

Synopsis:

Altering the distribution of revenue from a specified State tax in a specified manner; creating the Special Fund for Preservation of Cultural Arts in Maryland; providing that the purpose of the Fund is to provide emergency grants to prevent the closure or termination of cultural arts organizations, including museums, or similar entities in the State; extending the termination date from July 1, 2009, to July 1, 2012, for the authority for the operation of instant bingo games using electronic machines; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/26
First Reading Ways and Means
2/4
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/19
Third Reading Passed (127-8)
4/8
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (112-24)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/20
First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/30
Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 661

Sponsored by:

Delegate Mary Ann E. Love, District 32
Delegate Sue Kullen, District 27B

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Admissions and Amusement Tax
Anne Arundel County
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs -see also- Museums; Theaters
Bingo
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Gaming -see also- Bingo; Lottery; Raffles
Grants
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers` Licenses
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Museums
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.
Sunset

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Criminal Law
( 12-301 )
Economic Development
( 4-801 )
Tax - General
( 2-202 , 4-102 , 4-105 , 4-105 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 845865/01     Offered on: March 17, 2009   at: 10:31 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 299130/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 4:55 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 539634/01     Offered on: April 10, 2009   at: 10:30 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 19, 2009: Third Reading Passed (127-8)
April 8, 2009: Third Reading Passed (112-24)
Senate
April 6, 2009: Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Click to return on the top page