Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2010 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 517

File Code: Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 756
Sponsored By:
Senators Stone, Jacobs, Forehand, Mooney, and Simonaire
Entitled:
Maryland Gang Prosecution Act of 2010

Synopsis:

Altering the definition of criminal gang to repeal the requirement that an association of three or more persons whose members meet specified criteria be ongoing; altering specified factors that persons can have in common to be considered a criminal gang; altering the list of underlying crimes for criminal gang activity; altering a specified prohibition concerning participation in criminal gang activity to repeal the requirement that a pattern of criminal gang activity be ongoing; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/3
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/12
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/4
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order 4/9 (Senator Pugh) Adopted (23-21)
4/6
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (36-11)
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin)
Special Order later today (Senator Jones) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) Rejected (15-31)
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) Rejected (11-34)
Floor Amendment (Senator Lenett) Rejected (21-26)
Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) Rejected (17-29)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kelley) Rejected (11-35)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/7
Third Reading Passed (35-9)
4/10
Returned Passed
House Action
4/6
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
4/12
Re-referred Judiciary
Hearing 4/12 at 4:00 p.m.
Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/8
Favorable Report Adopted
Motion Special Order later today (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected (22-107)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Rejected (34-98)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Braveboy) Rejected (32-101)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Gutierrez) Rejected (25-106)
Second Reading Passed
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (120-20)
Third Reading Passed (116-25)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/4
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 197

Sponsored by:

Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr., District 6
Senator Jennie M. Forehand, District 17
Senator Nancy Jacobs, District 34
Senator Alexander X. Mooney, District 3
Senator Bryan W. Simonaire, District 31

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Gangs
Notices
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Criminal Law
( 9-801 , 9-804 , 9-805 , 9-806 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 133528/01     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 3:10 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 153822/01     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 2:57 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 248170/01     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 11:13 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 343924/02     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 3:04 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 733022/03     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 2:25 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 823426/03     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 2:53 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 993322/01     Offered on: April 10, 2010   at: 2:26 p.m.     Status: Rejected
House
Number: 613825/01     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:38 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 613928/01     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:40 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 713326/01     Offered on: April 12, 2010   at: 10:33 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
House
Judiciary
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
April 4, 2010: Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Pugh) Adopted (23-21)
April 6, 2010: Favorable with Amendments Adopted (36-11)
April 6, 2010: Floor Amendment (Pugh) {993322/1 Rejected (15-31)
April 6, 2010: Floor Amendment (Pugh) {823426/3 Rejected (11-34)
April 6, 2010: Floor Amendment (Lenett) {153822/1 Rejected (21-26)
April 6, 2010: Floor Amendment (Gladden) {343924/2 Rejected (17-29)
April 6, 2010: Floor Amendment (Kelley) {133528/1 Rejected (11-35)
April 7, 2010: Third Reading Passed (35-9)
House
April 8, 2010: Motion Special Order until later today (Gutierrez) Rejected (22-107)
April 8, 2010: Floor Amendment (Pena) Rejected (34-98)
April 8, 2010: Floor Amendment (Braveboy) {613825/1 Rejected (32-101)
April 8, 2010: Floor Amendment (Gutierrez) {613928/1 Rejected (25-106)
April 8, 2010: Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Vallario) Adopted (120-20)
April 8, 2010: Third Reading Passed (116-25)
Click to return on the top page