Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 70

File Code: Operating Budget
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration)
Entitled:
Budget Bill Fiscal Year 2012

Synopsis:

Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2012, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/21
First Reading Appropriations
3/21

Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/19
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order until 3/23 (Delegate Conway) Adopted
3/21
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment (#1-13)
Committee Amendment (#1-11) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#12) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#13) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#14-26) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#27-35) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#36-49) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#50-71) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#72-88) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#89-111) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#112-127) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#128-162) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (39-95)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) Rejected (39-96)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (42-94)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Vitale) Rejected (52-82)
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) Rejected (44-90)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (53-80)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (11-121)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (55-80)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) Rejected (49-81)
Motion Special Order until later today Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (97-42)
3/28
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Conway, Bohanan, Gaines, James, Beitzel
House advisors:
Clagett g, DeBoy, Griffith, Jones
4/3
Special Order until p.m. session (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
4/4
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Budget and Taxation
3/28
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/26
Favorable with Amendments
Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
3/27
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment (#1-12) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#13-23) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#24-38) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#39-55) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#56-64) Adopted
Committee Amendment (#65-70) Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) Adopted (#71)
Special Order until p.m. session (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (13-33)
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn
Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) Rejected (10-35)
Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) Rejected (18-29)
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Withdrawn
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted (46-0)
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Rejected (16-30)
Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-31)
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (37-10)
3/28
Senate Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed
Kasemeyer, McFadden, DeGrange, Madaleno, Edwards
Senate advisors:
Robey, Jones v, Currie, Brinkley
4/4
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/8
Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6)
of the Maryland Constitution
5/10
Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 395

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Not available at this time
Amendments:
House
Number: 263626/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 6:15 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 353024/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 6:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 563526/03     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 5:59 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 593628/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 6:04 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 633824/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 6:54 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 683129/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 7:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 683129/02     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 7:18 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 753026/02     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 6:37 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 943020/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 6:29 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Senate
Number: 213524/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 4:24 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 293826/02     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 4:31 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 393120/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 4:22 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Number: 543025/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 6:45 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 673224/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 4:38 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Number: 699933/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 10:49 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 763328/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 4:18 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 973720/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 6:42 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
House
Appropriations
Senate
Budget and Taxation
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (Krebs) {563526/3 Rejected (39-95)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (Ready) {593628/1 Rejected (39-96)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (McMillan) {353024/1 Rejected (42-94)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (Vitale) {263626/1 Rejected (52-82)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (George) {943020/1 Rejected (44-90)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (Parrott) Rejected (53-80)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (McMillan) Rejected (11-121)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (McDonough) {683129/1 Rejected (55-80)
March 21, 2011: Floor Amendment (McDonough) {683129/2 Rejected (49-81)
March 22, 2011: Third Reading Passed (97-42)
April 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (96-41)
Senate
March 27, 2011: Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {763328/1 Rejected (13-33)
March 27, 2011: Floor Amendment (Gladden) {213524/1 Rejected (10-35)
March 27, 2011: Floor Amendment (Shank) {293826/2 Rejected (18-29)
March 27, 2011: Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Kasemeyer) Adopted (46-0)
March 27, 2011: Floor Amendment (Reilly) {973720/1 Rejected (16-30)
March 27, 2011: Floor Amendment (Reilly) {543025/1 Rejected (15-31)
March 27, 2011: Third Reading Passed (37-10)
April 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Click to return on the top page