Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 162

File Code: Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 178
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Clagett, Arora, Cullison, Dumais, Lee, Mitchell, Niemann, Reznik, Stein, and Valderrama
Entitled:
Criminal Law - Child Neglect

Synopsis:

Prohibiting a parent, family member, household member, or other person who has permanent or temporary care or custody or responsibility for supervision of a minor from neglecting the minor; establishing the misdemeanor of child neglect and providing specified penalties for a violation of the Act; establishing that a sentence imposed under the Act is in addition to a specified other sentence, except under specified circumstances; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/26
First Reading Judiciary
2/9
Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21

Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/20
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/21
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
4/4
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/24
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/2
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/3
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-5)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 399

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Sam Arora, District 19
Delegate Galen R. Clagett, District 3A
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate Kathleen M. Dumais, District 15
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Keiffer J. Mitchell, Jr., District 44
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate Dana Stein, District 11
Delegate Kriselda Valderrama, District 26

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Child Abuse and Neglect
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Mental Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Reports

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Criminal Law
( 3-602.1 )
Family Law
( 5-704 , 5-705 , 5-706 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 202113/01     Offered on: March 22, 2011   at: 10:59 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 278678/01     Offered on: April 6, 2011   at: 11:47 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Judiciary
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 21, 2011: Third Reading Passed (138-0)
April 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 3, 2011: Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Click to return on the top page