Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 807

File Code: Private Sector Labor and Industry
Sponsored By:
Delegates McHale and Hammen
Entitled:
Labor and Employment - Health Care Personnel Training Fund

Synopsis:

Establishing the Health Care Personnel Training Fund as a special fund to be used to provide grants to specified training consortiums.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/11
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/17
Re-assigned Economic Matters
2/23
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29

Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/27
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/28
Third Reading Passed (114-20)
4/8
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (122-16)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/29
First Reading Senate Rules
4/6
Re-referred Finance
4/7
Hearing 4/7 at 2:30 p.m.
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/7
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 601

Sponsored by:

Delegate Brian K. McHale, District 46
Delegate Peter A. Hammen, District 46

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Grants
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Job Training
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.

Bill affects the following Statute:

Labor and Employment
( 11-1015 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 563195/01     Offered on: March 29, 2011   at: 11:17 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 927471/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 12:11 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Economic Matters
Senate
Finance
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 28, 2011: Third Reading Passed (114-20)
April 8, 2011: Third Reading Passed (122-16)
Senate
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Click to return on the top page