Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation


2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1213

File Code: Taxes - Miscellaneous
Sponsored By:
Delegate Howard
Entitled:
Sales and Use Tax - Alcoholic Beverages - Supplementary Appropriation

Synopsis:

Increasing the State sales and use tax rate for alcoholic beverages sold in Maryland to 9% of the taxable price of the alcoholic beverage; and making the Act a supplementary appropriation to fund specified public school construction projects and related capital improvements.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/18
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/28
Re-referred Ways and Means
3/1
Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9

Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/6
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (51-84)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates)
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Bates)
Motion to keep bill & Amendments before House Adopted (78-48)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bates) Rejected (50-77)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Bromwell) Rejected (54-73)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hough) Rejected (47-84)
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) Rejected (47-81)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) Rejected (53-74)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) Rejected (46-83)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) Rejected (48-80)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (46-83)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (49-79)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Mizeur) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (49-78)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (46-81)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-76)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (45-80)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/7
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Donoghue) Adopted (79-54)
Third Reading Passed (78-62)
4/9
Returned Passed
Senate Action
4/6
First Reading Senate Rules
4/11
Re-referred Budget and Taxation
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
4/7
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/8
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) Rejected (12-33)
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (17-28)
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (17-28)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (16-29)
Special Order until later today (Senator Getty) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) Rejected (13-31)
Third Reading Passed (26-19)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 572

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Alcoholic Beverages -see also- AB-By Subd; Subst Abuse; etc.
Appropriations
Construction
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.
Sales and Use Tax

Bill affects the following Statute:

Tax - General
( 11-104 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 153024/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 10:35 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 213426/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 8:55 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 273520/02     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 9:33 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 373126/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 7:42 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 385160/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 6:57 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 393026/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 9:54 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 483422/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 8:39 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 503627/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 9:42 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 663425/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 9:26 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 683026/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 9:48 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 713229/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 8:08 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 743228/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 10:47 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 763028/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 9:12 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 913324/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 10:20 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Senate
Number: 153720/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 10:29 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 263824/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 9:46 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 333326/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 10:14 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 753329/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 9:57 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 753627/01     Offered on: April 11, 2011   at: 10:05 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Committee Votes :
House
Ways and Means
Senate
Budget and Taxation
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
April 6, 2011: Motion Special Order until 4/11 (ODonnell) Rejected (51-84)
April 6, 2011: Motion to keep bill & Amendments before House (Frick) Adopted (78-48)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Bates) Rejected (50-77)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Bromwell) {713229/1 Rejected (54-73)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Hough) {483422/1 Rejected (47-84)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (George) {213426/1 Rejected (47-81)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Ready) {763028/1 Rejected (53-74)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (McComas) {663425/1 Rejected (46-83)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (McComas) {273520/2 Rejected (48-80)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Krebs) {503627/1 Rejected (46-83)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {683026/1 Rejected (49-79)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Szeliga) Rejected (49-78)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Szeliga) {913324/1 Rejected (46-81)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Krebs) {153024/1 Rejected (47-76)
April 6, 2011: Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {743228/1 Rejected (45-80)
April 7, 2011: Motion vote previous question (Donoghue) Adopted (79-54)
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (78-62)
Senate
April 8, 2011: Floor Amendment (Getty) {263824/1 Rejected (12-33)
April 8, 2011: Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {753329/1 Rejected (17-28)
April 8, 2011: Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {753627/1 Rejected (17-28)
April 8, 2011: Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {333326/1 Rejected (16-29)
April 8, 2011: Floor Amendment (Getty) {153720/1 Rejected (13-31)
April 8, 2011: Third Reading Passed (26-19)
Click to return on the top page