Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsored by
Worcester County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Adding Worcester County to the list of counties where an existing agricultural building used for agritourism is not considered a change of occupancy that requires a building permit if the subordinate use of agritourism does not require more than 200 people to occupy an individual building at any one time and the total width of means of egress meets or exceeds the International Building Code standard that applies to egress components other than stairways in a building without a sprinkler system.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0032
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/25/2021
Legislative Date
10/25/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133828/1
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133828/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803029/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/25/2021 10/25/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:25 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {133828/1 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Barve) Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {133828/1 Adopted 34AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803029/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text - Chapter - Worcester County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:50 PM
Click to return on the top page