Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship
Sponsored by
Delegates Boyce, Amprey, Barve, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring producers of architectural paint or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2023, and in accordance with certain requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve certain plans, including a certain assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of certain architectural paint under certain circumstances beginning on a certain date; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0143
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0127 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2021
Legislative Date
10/26/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {613922/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (51-78)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {673327/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-91)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Paint Stewardship
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2021 10/26/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Paint Stewardship
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing 2/23 at 12:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {153126/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {613922/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (51-78) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Floor Amendment {673327/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-91) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Paint Stewardship
House 3/11/2022 3/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/02/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/15/2022 1:03 PM
Click to return on the top page